Senate | 05/08/2013 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 30, Statutes of 2013. | ||
Senate | 05/08/2013 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11:45 a.m. | ||
Senate | 05/02/2013 | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 1. Page 775.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Senate | 04/29/2013 | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. | ||
Assembly | 04/25/2013 | Read. Amended. Adopted. (Page 1116.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 04/15/2013 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 15). | ||
Assembly | 04/11/2013 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 03/18/2013 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 03/18/2013 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 30. Noes 1. Page 309.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 03/14/2013 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 03/04/2013 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |