Senate | 08/29/2013 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 87, Statutes of 2013. | ||
Senate | 08/29/2013 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 10 a.m. | ||
Senate | 08/22/2013 | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1949.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Senate | 08/20/2013 | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. | ||
Assembly | 08/19/2013 | Read. Amended. Adopted. (Page 2594.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 06/27/2013 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 27). | ||
Assembly | 04/11/2013 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 03/18/2013 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 03/18/2013 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 31. Noes 0. Page 309.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 03/14/2013 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. Ordered to special consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 03/04/2013 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |