Senate | 06/26/2013 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 55, Statutes of 2013. | ||
Senate | 06/26/2013 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 4 p.m. | ||
Senate | 06/20/2013 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Assembly | 06/20/2013 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 2111.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 06/17/2013 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 17). | ||
Assembly | 05/09/2013 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 04/22/2013 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 04/22/2013 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 604.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 03/14/2013 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 03/12/2013 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |