California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SCR23 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 13, 2013

Enrolled

Bill September 3, 2013

Chaptered

Bill September 6, 2013

Amended

Bill August 5, 2013
Bill April 9, 2013
Bill April 1, 2013