Senate
|
08/29/2013
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 88, Statutes of 2013.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/29/2013
|
Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 10 a.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2013
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/26/2013
|
Read. Adopted. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2724.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/21/2013
|
From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 21).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/13/2013
|
From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (August 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/20/2013
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/24/2013
|
In Assembly. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2013
|
Read. Adopted. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 1045.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2013
|
Set for hearing May 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2013
|
From committee: Be adopted as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 760.) (April 30).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2013
|
Set for hearing April 30.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2013
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2013
|
Set for hearing April 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2013
|
Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|