Senate | 05/23/2013 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 38, Statutes of 2013. | ||
Senate | 05/23/2013 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11 a.m. | ||
Senate | 05/20/2013 | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 973.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Senate | 05/15/2013 | Ordered to special consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 05/13/2013 | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. | ||
Assembly | 05/09/2013 | Read. Amended. Adopted. (Page 1340.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 05/06/2013 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (May 6). | ||
Assembly | 04/11/2013 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 04/04/2013 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 04/04/2013 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 412.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 04/03/2013 | From committee: Ordered to third reading Ordered to special consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 04/01/2013 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. (Corrected April 4.) |