Senate | 08/20/2013 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 79, Statutes of 2013. | ||
Senate | 08/20/2013 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2:30 p.m. | ||
Senate | 08/15/2013 | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 36. Noes 2. Page 1852.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Senate | 08/12/2013 | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. | ||
Assembly | 08/05/2013 | Read. Adopted. (Page 2388.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 07/01/2013 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (July 1). | ||
Assembly | 06/27/2013 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 06/20/2013 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 04/15/2013 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 04/15/2013 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 521.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 04/03/2013 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 04/01/2013 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |