Senate | 08/29/2013 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 89, Statutes of 2013. | ||
Senate | 08/29/2013 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 10 a.m. | ||
Senate | 08/26/2013 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Assembly | 08/26/2013 | Read. Adopted. (Page 2705.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 08/05/2013 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (August 5). | ||
Assembly | 06/27/2013 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 06/24/2013 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 06/24/2013 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 31. Noes 0. Page 1482.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 06/11/2013 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 06/10/2013 | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | ||
Senate | 06/03/2013 | From inactive file. Ordered to second reading. | ||
Senate | 04/18/2013 | Ordered to inactive file on request of Senator Corbett. | ||
Senate | 04/10/2013 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 04/02/2013 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |