Senate | 08/06/2013 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 67, Statutes of 2013. | ||
Senate | 08/06/2013 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 10:15 a.m. | ||
Senate | 07/08/2013 | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 29. Noes 0. Page 1680.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Senate | 06/25/2013 | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. | ||
Assembly | 06/24/2013 | Read. Amended. Adopted. (Page 2131.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 06/20/2013 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 20). | ||
Assembly | 06/10/2013 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 04/11/2013 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 04/11/2013 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 496.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 04/10/2013 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. Ordered to special consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 04/02/2013 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |