Senate | 08/29/2013 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 90, Statutes of 2013. | ||
Senate | 08/29/2013 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 10 a.m. | ||
Senate | 08/22/2013 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Assembly | 08/22/2013 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2673.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 08/15/2013 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 15). | ||
Assembly | 06/20/2013 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 04/25/2013 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 04/25/2013 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 676.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 04/23/2013 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 04/22/2013 | From inactive file. Ordered to second reading. | ||
Senate | 04/11/2013 | Ordered to inactive file on request of Senator Correa. | ||
Senate | 04/10/2013 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 04/04/2013 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |