Assembly | 06/20/2013 | Referred to Com. on TRANS. | ||
Assembly | 05/16/2013 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 05/16/2013 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 948.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 05/14/2013 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 05/13/2013 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 05/03/2013 | Set for hearing May 13. | ||
Senate | 05/01/2013 | From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 760.) (April 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 04/23/2013 | Set for hearing April 30. | ||
Senate | 04/22/2013 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. | ||
Senate | 04/18/2013 | Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. | ||
Senate | 04/15/2013 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |