Senate | 08/15/2013 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 71, Statutes of 2013. | ||
Senate | 08/15/2013 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11 a.m. | ||
Senate | 08/12/2013 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Assembly | 08/08/2013 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2482.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 07/03/2013 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (July 3). | ||
Assembly | 07/02/2013 | From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (July 1). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 06/10/2013 | Referred to Com. on TRANS. | ||
Assembly | 05/24/2013 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 05/24/2013 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 1045.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 05/21/2013 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 05/20/2013 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 05/10/2013 | Set for hearing May 20. | ||
Senate | 05/07/2013 | From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 853.) (May 7). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 04/30/2013 | Set for hearing May 7. | ||
Senate | 04/25/2013 | Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. | ||
Senate | 04/16/2013 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |