Assembly | 09/11/2013 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (September 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 09/10/2013 | Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Page 3147.) | ||
Assembly | 08/19/2013 | Referred to Com. on TRANS. | ||
Assembly | 08/15/2013 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 08/15/2013 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1856.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 08/14/2013 | From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 08/12/2013 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 07/11/2013 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 06/25/2013 | From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 1571.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 06/18/2013 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. | ||
Senate | 06/15/2013 | Set for hearing June 25. | ||
Senate | 05/29/2013 | Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. | ||
Senate | 05/20/2013 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |