LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SCR49
Action History
CA
California Senate Bill SCR49
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SCR49
Action History
Senate
07/08/2013
Read. Refused adoption. (Ayes 15. Noes 14. Page 1682.) Motion to reconsider made by Senator Knight. Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 1683.)
Senate
07/01/2013
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
Senate
06/27/2013
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
Senate
06/20/2013
From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading.
Senate
06/13/2013
From committee: Ordered to third reading. Ordered to special consent calendar.
Senate
06/03/2013
Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS.