Senate | 09/10/2013 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 114, Statutes of 2013. | ||
Senate | 09/10/2013 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 4:30 p.m. | ||
Senate | 09/05/2013 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Assembly | 09/04/2013 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2881.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 08/30/2013 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (August 30). | ||
Assembly | 08/19/2013 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 08/15/2013 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 08/15/2013 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1854.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 06/20/2013 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 06/17/2013 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |