Senate | 09/12/2013 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 118, Statutes of 2013. | ||
Senate | 09/12/2013 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2 p.m. | ||
Senate | 09/10/2013 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Assembly | 09/10/2013 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 3149.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 09/06/2013 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (September 6). | ||
Assembly | 07/03/2013 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 07/01/2013 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 07/01/2013 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 1604.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 06/27/2013 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 06/19/2013 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |