Senate | 09/10/2013 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 115, Statutes of 2013. | ||
Senate | 09/10/2013 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 4:30 p.m. | ||
Senate | 09/05/2013 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Assembly | 09/04/2013 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2882.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 08/30/2013 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 30). | ||
Assembly | 08/27/2013 | From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (August 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 08/19/2013 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Assembly | 08/15/2013 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 08/15/2013 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1854.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 08/13/2013 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 08/12/2013 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 07/03/2013 | From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 1665.) (July 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 06/28/2013 | Set for hearing July 2. | ||
Senate | 06/27/2013 | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Senate | 06/24/2013 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |