Assembly | 09/11/2013 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (September 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 09/10/2013 | Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Page 3147.) | ||
Assembly | 08/19/2013 | Referred to Com. on TRANS. | ||
Assembly | 08/15/2013 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 08/15/2013 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1844.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 08/12/2013 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 07/11/2013 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 07/09/2013 | From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 1726.) (July 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 07/03/2013 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. | ||
Senate | 06/28/2013 | Set for hearing July 9. | ||
Senate | 06/27/2013 | Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. | ||
Senate | 06/25/2013 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |