BILL NUMBER: SCR 57CHAPTERED BILL TEXT RESOLUTION CHAPTER 5 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE FEBRUARY 3, 2014 ADOPTED IN SENATE SEPTEMBER 11, 2013 ADOPTED IN ASSEMBLY JANUARY 29, 2014 AMENDED IN SENATE AUGUST 26, 2013 AMENDED IN SENATE AUGUST 12, 2013 INTRODUCED BY Senator Hernandez JULY 1, 2013 Relative to the CHP Officers Harold E. Horine and Bill Leiphardt Memorial Highway. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SCR 57, Hernandez. The CHP Officers Harold E. Horine and Bill Leiphardt Memorial Highway. This measure would designate a portion of Interstate 10 in the County of Los Angeles as the CHP Officers Harold E. Horine and Bill Leiphardt Memorial Highway. The measure would request the Department of Transportation to determine the cost for appropriate signs showing this designation and, upon receiving donations from nonstate sources covering that cost, to erect those signs. WHEREAS, California Highway Patrol Officers Harold Horine and Bill Leiphardt made the ultimate sacrifice while performing their sworn duty, and in recognition thereof, we pay special tribute to their bravery and dedication; and WHEREAS, On May 13, 1978, the state suffered a tragic loss when California Highway Patrol Officers Harold Horine and Bill Leiphardt were struck by a drunk driver while investigating a roadside crash involving an abandoned vehicle; and WHEREAS, Officer Harold Eugene Horine was born March 13, 1939, to Martin and Ruth, in El Monte, California, and had four siblings: Leroy, Dilbert, Ruthie, and Maria; and WHEREAS, Officer Horine graduated from El Monte Christian High School in 1957 and worked a few jobs, including as a construction worker, prior to joining the Department of the California Highway Patrol; and WHEREAS, Officer Horine married the love of his life, Rita, on September 20, 1957, and had four wonderful daughters: Cathy, born April 18, 1959, Loretta, born July 13, 1960, Connie, born September 17, 1961, and Tammy, born May 9, 1970; and WHEREAS, Officer Horine, badge number 6686, graduated from the California Highway Patrol Academy in 1968 and, upon graduation, was assigned to the Baldwin Park Area Office, where he proudly served for approximately 10 years; and WHEREAS, Officer Horine was a hard working, dedicated officer who loved his job and enjoyed the people he worked with. He was known for being a loyal family man and a wonderful father and husband. His greatest joys were his wife and children. Officer Horine had an incredible optimism, a great sense of adventure, and enthusiasm for life. In his spare time, he enjoyed skiing, boating, and camping; and WHEREAS, Officer Horine is survived by three of his siblings, his wife and daughters, and 11 grandchildren: AJ, Blake, Brandi, Brent, Brian, Corey, Jamie, Lisa, Richie, Rochelle, and Sheri; and WHEREAS, Officer William Ferris Leiphardt, Jr. was born January 4, 1939, to William and Lois, in La Junta, Colorado; and WHEREAS, Officer Leiphardt graduated from Saint Mary's High School in Long Beach, California, and attended Mt. San Antonio College in Walnut, California, immediately thereafter; and WHEREAS, Officer Leiphardt served in the United States Air Force from 1958 to 1964 before deciding to join the Department of the California Highway Patrol; and WHEREAS, Officer Leiphardt married his best friend, Marie, on November 5, 1960, and had four wonderful children: Christine, Lisa, Tony, and Eric; and WHEREAS, Officer Leiphardt, badge number 4911, was assigned to the Baldwin Park Area Office, where he proudly served for approximately 12 years; and WHEREAS, Officer Leiphardt was a devoted officer, husband, and father and was known for his sense of humor and commitment to his family, the Department of the California Highway Patrol, and the citizens of California. In his spare time, he enjoyed playing golf, coaching football and baseball, and spending time with his family and friends; and WHEREAS, Officer Leiphardt is survived by his brother Richard, wife and children, and his six grandchildren: Ashley, Brandon, Brittani, Cole, O'Ryan, and Steven; and WHEREAS, In recognition of Officers Harold Horine and Bill Leiphardt's contributions and sacrifices in serving the Department of the California Highway Patrol and the citizens of California, it would be fitting to designate the portion of Interstate 10 from the Baldwin Park Overcrossing to the Sunset Avenue Undercrossing in the County of Los Angeles as the CHP Officers Harold E. Horine and Bill Leiphardt Memorial Highway in their honor; now, therefore, be it Resolved by the Senate of the State of California, the Assembly thereof concurring, That the Legislature hereby designates the portion of Interstate 10 from the Baldwin Park Overcrossing to the Sunset Avenue Undercrossing in the County of Los Angeles as the CHP Officers Harold E. Horine and Bill Leiphardt Memorial Highway; and be it further Resolved, That the Department of Transportation is requested to determine the costs of erecting the appropriate signs, consistent with the signing requirements for the state highway system, showing these special designations, and upon receiving donations from nonstate sources covering the cost, to erect those signs; and be it further Resolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the Director of Transportation and to the author for appropriate distribution.