Assembly | 09/11/2013 | Referred to Com. on TRANS. Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Page 3197.) Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 09/10/2013 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 09/10/2013 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 22. Noes 7. Page 2302.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 09/09/2013 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 09/06/2013 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. | ||
Senate | 08/26/2013 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 08/22/2013 | From committee: Be adopted as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 3. Page 1934.) (August 20). | ||
Senate | 08/14/2013 | Set for hearing August 20. | ||
Senate | 07/03/2013 | Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. | ||
Senate | 07/01/2013 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |