BILL NUMBER: SCR 6CHAPTERED BILL TEXT RESOLUTION CHAPTER 85 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE AUGUST 29, 2013 ADOPTED IN SENATE APRIL 18, 2013 ADOPTED IN ASSEMBLY AUGUST 26, 2013 INTRODUCED BY Senator Wolk (Coauthor: Assembly Member Bonilla) JANUARY 8, 2013 Relative to the Vallejo Police Officer James Capoot Memorial Highway. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SCR 6, Wolk. Vallejo Police Officer James Capoot Memorial Highway. This measure would designate the portion of State Highway 37 between Interstate 80 and State Highway 29 as the Vallejo Police Officer James Capoot Memorial Highway. The measure would request that the Department of Transportation determine the cost of appropriate signs showing this special designation and, upon receiving donations from nonstate sources covering that cost, to erect those signs. WHEREAS, James Lowell Capoot was born on November 2, 1966, in Little Rock, Arkansas, attended local schools, and graduated from John L. McClellan High School in 1985, where he excelled on the cross country and track teams; and WHEREAS, After graduation, Jim enlisted in the United States Marine Corps, and was stationed at the Mare Island Naval Shipyard in Vallejo, where he met the love of his life, Jennifer Eileen DeCarlo; and WHEREAS, Jim and Jennifer were married at St. Basil's Catholic Church in Vallejo on August 29, 1987, and they are the parents of three daughters-Jillian, Jamie, and Justine; and WHEREAS, Jim completed active duty with the United States Marine Corps in 1989, but remained on active reserve until 1993, and he began his law enforcement career with the Department of the California Highway Patrol in 1990; and WHEREAS, In 1993, Jim joined the Vallejo Police Department, where he served for over 18 years as a motorcycle officer, motorcycle instructor, driving instructor, and SWAT officer; and WHEREAS, During his service with the Vallejo Police Department, Jim received two Medals of Courage, one Life-Saving Medal, and many other department commendations, as well as the Officer of the Year Award; and WHEREAS, Jim also served his community as coach of the Vallejo High School varsity girls' basketball team, leading that team to a Sac-Joaquin Section Division II Championship in 2010; and WHEREAS, Jim was killed in the line of duty on November 17, 2011, and his loss was mourned not only by his wife, daughters, mother, and the rest of his family, and his friends and colleagues, but also mourned throughout the community of Vallejo, which he had served with such dedication and distinction; now, therefore, be it Resolved by the Senate of the State of California, the Assembly thereof concurring, That the Legislature hereby designates the portion of State Highway 37 between Interstate 80 and State Highway 29 as the Vallejo Police Officer James Capoot Memorial Highway; and be it further Resolved, That the Department of Transportation is requested to determine the cost of appropriate signs consistent with the signing requirements for the state highway system showing this special designation and, upon receiving donations from nonstate sources sufficient to cover the cost, to erect those signs; and be it further Resolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the Department of Transportation and to the author for appropriate distribution.