Senate | 09/20/2013 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 127, Statutes of 2013. | ||
Senate | 09/20/2013 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 10:30 a.m. | ||
Senate | 09/12/2013 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Assembly | 09/12/2013 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 65. Noes 3. Page 3277.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 09/11/2013 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (September 11). | ||
Assembly | 09/10/2013 | Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Page 3147.) | ||
Assembly | 08/30/2013 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Assembly | 08/26/2013 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 08/26/2013 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 30. Noes 6. Page 1977.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 08/14/2013 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 07/11/2013 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |