Senate | 09/12/2013 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 119, Statutes of 2013. | ||
Senate | 09/12/2013 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2 p.m. | ||
Senate | 09/09/2013 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Assembly | 09/09/2013 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 3030.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 08/30/2013 | Referred to Com. on RLS. From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (August 30). | ||
Assembly | 08/26/2013 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 08/26/2013 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1974.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 08/22/2013 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 08/12/2013 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |