Senate | 09/20/2013 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 128, Statutes of 2013. | ||
Senate | 09/20/2013 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 10:30 a.m. | ||
Senate | 09/12/2013 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Assembly | 09/12/2013 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 3276.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 09/11/2013 | From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 09/09/2013 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (September 9). | ||
Assembly | 09/06/2013 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 09/03/2013 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 09/03/2013 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 34. Noes 2. Page 2089.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 08/27/2013 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 08/26/2013 | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | ||
Senate | 08/22/2013 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 08/13/2013 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |