Senate | 09/20/2013 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 129, Statutes of 2013. | ||
Senate | 09/20/2013 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 10:30 a.m. | ||
Senate | 09/12/2013 | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2431.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Senate | 09/11/2013 | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. | ||
Assembly | 09/11/2013 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 3246.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 09/09/2013 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (September 9). | ||
Assembly | 09/06/2013 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 08/30/2013 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 08/26/2013 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 08/26/2013 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1975.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 08/22/2013 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 08/14/2013 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |