Senate | 09/20/2013 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 130, Statutes of 2013. | ||
Senate | 09/20/2013 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 10:30 a.m. | ||
Senate | 09/12/2013 | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2401.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Assembly | 09/11/2013 | Read. Amended. Adopted. (Page 3225.) Ordered to the Senate. (Corrected September 12.) | ||
Assembly | 09/09/2013 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (September 9). | ||
Assembly | 09/06/2013 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 09/04/2013 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 09/04/2013 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2138.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 08/29/2013 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 08/20/2013 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |