Senate
|
09/05/2014
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 148, Statutes of 2014.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/05/2014
|
Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11 a.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/29/2014
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/29/2014
|
Read. Adopted. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6716.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/27/2014
|
From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (August 27).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/26/2014
|
From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (August 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/18/2014
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/13/2014
|
In Assembly. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/13/2014
|
From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading. Read. Adopted. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4468.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/12/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2014
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/07/2014
|
Set for hearing August 11.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/05/2014
|
From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 4336.) (August 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/31/2014
|
Set for hearing August 5.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2014
|
Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2014
|
Set for hearing April 29.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2014
|
Set for hearing April 1.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/23/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/12/2013
|
Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|