Senate | 01/28/2014 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 1, Statutes of 2014. | ||
Senate | 01/28/2014 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3 p.m. | ||
Senate | 01/23/2014 | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 2637.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Senate | 01/22/2014 | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. | ||
Assembly | 01/21/2014 | Read. Amended. Adopted. (Page 3635.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 01/17/2014 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. Referred to Com. on RLS. From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (January 17). | ||
Senate | 01/17/2014 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 25. Noes 0. Page 2611.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 01/13/2014 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 01/06/2014 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |