Senate
|
06/26/2014
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 74, Statutes of 2014.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2014
|
Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/23/2014
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/23/2014
|
Read. Adopted. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 5650.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/18/2014
|
From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 18).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/10/2014
|
From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (June 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/15/2014
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/01/2014
|
In Assembly. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2014
|
Read. Adopted. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 3329.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2014
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2014
|
Set for hearing April 28.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2014
|
From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 3039.) (April 1). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2014
|
Set for hearing April 1.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/23/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/06/2014
|
Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|