Senate | 04/15/2014 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 15, Statutes of 2014. | ||
Senate | 04/15/2014 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 12:45 p.m. | ||
Senate | 04/10/2014 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Assembly | 04/10/2014 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 4329.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 04/03/2014 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 3). | ||
Assembly | 03/24/2014 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 03/17/2014 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 03/17/2014 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 2914.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 02/20/2014 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 02/04/2014 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |