LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SCR82
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SCR82
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SCR82
Compare Versions
SCR82 Chaptered June 19, 2014
SCR82 Enrolled June 17, 2014
SCR82 Amended June 4, 2014
SCR82 Amended April 9, 2014
SCR82 Introduced February 19, 2014
Version 1 (Old)
SCR82 Chaptered June 19, 2014
SCR82 Enrolled June 17, 2014
SCR82 Amended June 4, 2014
SCR82 Amended April 9, 2014
SCR82 Introduced February 19, 2014
Version 2 (New)
Compare