Senate | 06/16/2014 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 63, Statutes of 2014. | ||
Senate | 06/16/2014 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11 a.m. | ||
Senate | 06/12/2014 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Assembly | 06/12/2014 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 5496.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 06/10/2014 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 10). | ||
Assembly | 05/15/2014 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Assembly | 04/07/2014 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 04/07/2014 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 3074.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 04/02/2014 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 04/01/2014 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3018.) (April 1). | ||
Senate | 03/19/2014 | Set for hearing April 1. | ||
Senate | 03/06/2014 | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Senate | 02/20/2014 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |