California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SCR85 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 20, 2014

Enrolled

Bill July 7, 2014

Chaptered

Bill July 9, 2014

Amended

Bill June 16, 2014
Bill March 19, 2014