Assembly | 08/18/2014 | Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 08/14/2014 | Referred to Com. on TRANS. | ||
Assembly | 08/12/2014 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 08/11/2014 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4406.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 08/07/2014 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 08/06/2014 | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | ||
Senate | 06/12/2014 | From inactive file. Ordered to second reading. | ||
Senate | 05/01/2014 | From consent calendar. Ordered to inactive file on request of Senator Anderson. | ||
Senate | 04/29/2014 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 04/28/2014 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 04/11/2014 | Set for hearing April 28. | ||
Senate | 04/02/2014 | From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 3039.) (April 1). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 03/07/2014 | Set for hearing April 1. | ||
Senate | 03/06/2014 | Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. | ||
Senate | 02/21/2014 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |