Senate | 04/28/2014 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 19, Statutes of 2014. | ||
Senate | 04/28/2014 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2:30 p.m. | ||
Senate | 04/24/2014 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Assembly | 04/24/2014 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 4602.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 04/21/2014 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 21). | ||
Assembly | 03/20/2014 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 03/03/2014 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 03/03/2014 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 31. Noes 0. Page 2857.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 02/27/2014 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 02/21/2014 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |