Senate | 07/03/2014 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 80, Statutes of 2014. | ||
Senate | 07/03/2014 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 9:30 a.m. | ||
Senate | 06/30/2014 | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 4188.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Senate | 06/19/2014 | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. | ||
Assembly | 06/19/2014 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 5623.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 06/17/2014 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 16). | ||
Assembly | 05/12/2014 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. | ||
Assembly | 05/08/2014 | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. | ||
Assembly | 04/03/2014 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 04/03/2014 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 3045.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 03/06/2014 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 02/21/2014 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |