Senate | 08/18/2014 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 115, Statutes of 2014. | ||
Senate | 08/18/2014 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2:30 p.m. | ||
Senate | 08/14/2014 | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 31. Noes 0. Page 4491.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Senate | 08/11/2014 | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. | ||
Assembly | 08/07/2014 | Read. Amended. Adopted. (Page 5914.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 08/04/2014 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (August 4). | ||
Assembly | 06/19/2014 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 06/16/2014 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 06/16/2014 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 3927.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 06/11/2014 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 02/26/2014 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |