California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SCR96 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 03/10/2014

 BILL NUMBER: SCR 96INTRODUCED BILL TEXT INTRODUCED BY Senator Yee MARCH 10, 2014 Relative to Sunshine Week. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SCR 96, as introduced, Yee. Sunshine Week. This measure would designate March 16, 2014, through March 22, 2014, as Sunshine Week. Fiscal committee: no. WHEREAS, California has a long tradition in support of open government and access to government records; and WHEREAS, In 1968, California enacted the California Public Records Act that expressly declared that "access to information concerning the conduct of the people's business is a fundamental and necessary right of every person in this state"; and WHEREAS, In 1953, California enacted the Ralph M. Brown Open Meetings Act guaranteeing the public's right to attend and participate in local governing bodies; and WHEREAS, In 1968, the Bagley-Keene Open Meetings Act was adopted by the State to mandate open meetings of state agencies, boards, and commissions; and WHEREAS, California voters approved Proposition 59, a state constitutional amendment, also known as the "Sunshine Amendment," in 2004 that furthers open government protections and the rights of voters; and WHEREAS, Open government reforms continue to spread across the country, including the adoption of open data policies to urge innovation and economic development through the use of high-value government data; and WHEREAS, California entrepreneurs created the information technology revolution and are creating opportunities for government to use technology to improve performance, transparency, and trust; and WHEREAS, President Barack Obama issued an Open Government Directive to all federal departments and agencies that required the federal government to take steps towards a more open government including publishing government information online with the presumption of openness, to improve the quality of government information, and to institutionalize a culture of open government within departments and agencies; and WHEREAS, Many local governments have been leaders in open records and public meetings and the cities of San Francisco, Oakland, West Sacramento, and Los Angeles and the County of San Mateo have adopted open data policies; and WHEREAS, The Legislature has asked the voters of California to affirm the people's mandate for open government through Proposition 42, that will appear on the June 3, 2014, statewide primary election ballot; and WHEREAS, With an inaugural grant from the Knight Foundation, American Society of News Editors launched Sunshine Week in March 2005, and it continues to be celebrated each year in mid-March to coincide with National Freedom of Information Day and President James Madison's birthday on March 16; and WHEREAS, Although originally created by journalists, Sunshine Week is about the public's right to know what its government is doing and why; and WHEREAS, Sunshine Week is now a national initiative to promote a dialogue about the importance of open government and freedom of information. Participants include news media, civic groups, libraries, nonprofit entities, schools, and others interested in the public's right to know; and WHEREAS, Sunshine Week seeks to enlighten and empower people to play an active role in all levels of government, and to give people access to information that makes their lives better and their communities stronger; and WHEREAS, The coverage, commentaries, and activities promoting open government during Sunshine Week have led to tangible, meaningful changes to people's lives, and the laws that govern them; and WHEREAS, The California Newspaper Publishers' Association, California Forward, the League of Women Voters of California, Californians Aware, First Amendment Coalition, and other nongovernmental organizations continue to work alongside media and government allies to enhance public access to their government; and WHEREAS, Sunshine Week is increasing public awareness and people are playing more of a role in the actions that affect their communities. People are learning what kinds of information they have a right to see, how and where to obtain that information, and what to do if someone tries to prevent them from accessing it; now, therefore, be it Resolved by the Senate of the State of California, the Assembly thereof concurring, That Sunshine Week is a celebration of the public' s commitment to openness and an exploration of what open government means in a technology-enhanced future; and be it further Resolved, That the Legislature hereby designates March 16, 2014, through March 22, 2014, as Sunshine Week and encourages all Californians to participate in appropriate activities relating to open government and access to public information; and be it further Resolved, That the Secretary of the Senate provide copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.