Senate | 04/15/2014 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 17, Statutes of 2014. | ||
Senate | 04/15/2014 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 12:45 p.m. | ||
Senate | 04/10/2014 | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 3129.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Senate | 04/07/2014 | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. | ||
Assembly | 04/03/2014 | Read. Amended. Adopted. (Page 4333.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 04/01/2014 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 1). | ||
Assembly | 03/24/2014 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 03/20/2014 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 03/20/2014 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 2933.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 03/17/2014 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 03/10/2014 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |