Senate | 08/20/2013 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 83, Statutes of 2013. | ||
Senate | 08/20/2013 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2:30 p.m. | ||
Senate | 08/15/2013 | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 26. Noes 12. Page 1852.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Senate | 08/12/2013 | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. | ||
Assembly | 08/08/2013 | Read. Amended. Adopted. (Ayes 49. Noes 26. Page 2475.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 06/18/2013 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (June 18). | ||
Assembly | 04/11/2013 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | ||
Assembly | 03/07/2013 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 03/07/2013 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 24. Noes 10. Page 263.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 02/26/2013 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 4. Noes 2. Page 221.) (February 26). | ||
Senate | 02/15/2013 | Set for hearing February 26. | ||
Senate | 01/31/2013 | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | ||
Senate | 01/18/2013 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. (Corrected January 28.) |