Senate | 05/21/2013 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 37, Statutes of 2013. | ||
Senate | 05/21/2013 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3 p.m. | ||
Senate | 05/20/2013 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Assembly | 05/20/2013 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 60. Noes 9. Page 1525.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 05/16/2013 | Referred to Com. on RLS. From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (May 16). | ||
Assembly | 05/13/2013 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 05/13/2013 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 906.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 05/09/2013 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 05/08/2013 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |