Senate | 09/12/2013 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 122, Statutes of 2013. | ||
Senate | 09/12/2013 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2 p.m. | ||
Senate | 09/10/2013 | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 27. Noes 10. Page 2296.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Senate | 09/09/2013 | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. | ||
Assembly | 09/09/2013 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 51. Noes 25. Page 3026.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 09/04/2013 | Amended. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 09/03/2013 | From committee: Be adopted as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 3.) (August 29). | ||
Assembly | 08/19/2013 | Referred to Com. on J., E.D., & E. | ||
Assembly | 08/15/2013 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 08/15/2013 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 27. Noes 9. Page 1856.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 08/14/2013 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 08/12/2013 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |