Senate | 09/05/2014 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 152, Statutes of 2014. | ||
Senate | 09/05/2014 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11 a.m. | ||
Senate | 08/30/2014 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Assembly | 08/29/2014 | Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Page 6703.) Read. Adopted. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 6740.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 08/18/2014 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 08/18/2014 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 4564.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 08/13/2014 | Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 08/06/2014 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Senate | 09/10/2013 | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Senate | 09/05/2013 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |