Senate | 02/28/2013 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 6, Statutes of 2013. | ||
Senate | 02/28/2013 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 4:45 p.m. | ||
Senate | 02/25/2013 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Assembly | 02/25/2013 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 397.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 02/19/2013 | From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 02/15/2013 | Referred to Com. on RLS. From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (February 15). | ||
Assembly | 02/11/2013 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 02/11/2013 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 31. Noes 0. Page 132.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 02/06/2013 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 01/31/2013 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |