Senate | 08/11/2014 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 110, Statutes of 2014. | ||
Senate | 08/11/2014 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 4:30 p.m. | ||
Senate | 08/07/2014 | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 28. Noes 4. Page 4362.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Senate | 06/26/2014 | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. | ||
Assembly | 06/26/2014 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 5706.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 06/19/2014 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 19). | ||
Assembly | 06/17/2014 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 05/15/2014 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 05/01/2014 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 05/01/2014 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 28. Noes 3. Page 3320.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 03/27/2014 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 03/19/2014 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |