Senate | 06/24/2014 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 73, Statutes of 2014. | ||
Senate | 06/24/2014 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3:30 p.m. | ||
Senate | 06/19/2014 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Assembly | 06/19/2014 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 69. Noes 1. Page 5618.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 06/10/2014 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 10). | ||
Assembly | 05/23/2014 | Referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P. | ||
Assembly | 04/07/2014 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 04/07/2014 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 31. Noes 0. Page 3072.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 04/03/2014 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 03/24/2014 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |