Senate | 06/16/2014 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 66, Statutes of 2014. | ||
Senate | 06/16/2014 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11 a.m. | ||
Senate | 06/12/2014 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Assembly | 06/12/2014 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 5496.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 06/10/2014 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (June 9). | ||
Assembly | 05/15/2014 | Referred to Com. on TRANS. | ||
Assembly | 05/01/2014 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 05/01/2014 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 3322.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 04/23/2014 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 04/21/2014 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |