Senate | 07/09/2014 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 92, Statutes of 2014. | ||
Senate | 07/09/2014 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11 a.m. | ||
Senate | 07/03/2014 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Assembly | 07/03/2014 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 69. Noes 1. Page 5812.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 06/25/2014 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 25). | ||
Assembly | 06/12/2014 | Referred to Com. on INS. | ||
Assembly | 06/09/2014 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 06/09/2014 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 31. Noes 0. Page 3782.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 06/05/2014 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 05/28/2014 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |