LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SJR29
Action History
CA
California Senate Bill SJR29
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SJR29
Action History
Assembly
07/03/2014
Referred to Com. on A. & A.R.
Assembly
06/30/2014
In Assembly. Held at Desk.
Senate
06/30/2014
Read. Adopted. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4189.) Ordered to the Assembly.
Senate
06/24/2014
From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4072.) (June 23).
Senate
06/11/2014
Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
Senate
06/10/2014
Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS.