LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SJR31
Action History
CA
California Senate Bill SJR31
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SJR31
Action History
Assembly
08/20/2014
In Assembly. Held at Desk.
Senate
08/20/2014
Read. Adopted. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 4645.) Ordered to the Assembly.
Senate
08/19/2014
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
Senate
08/18/2014
From committee: Be adopted as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4515.) (August 14).
Senate
08/13/2014
Re-referred to Com. on JUD. Set for hearing August 14.
Senate
08/06/2014
Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS.